MO HB1312 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, noon or upon morning adjournment, Senate Lounge, BILL NOT HEARD
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-04 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, noon or upon morning adjournment, Senate Lounge, BILL NOT HEARD
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of economic development to classify tax credits as either directly or indirectly benefiting the state
Title
Requires the department of economic development to classify tax credits as either directly or indirectly benefiting the state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - HB 1312 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - HB 1312 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - HB 1312 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, noon or upon morning adjournment, Senate Lounge, BILL NOT HEARD |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2015-04-21 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |