MO HB1309 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Energy and Environment (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Energy and Environment (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Land Reclamation Commission to reject applications for permits to reactivate an inactive quarry if residential homes are located near the site
Title
Allows the Land Reclamation Commission to reject applications for permits to reactivate an inactive quarry if residential homes are located near the site
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Energy and Environment (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-02 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1309&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1309I.htm |