MO HB1308 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds prosecuting attorneys, assistant prosecuting attorneys, circuit attorneys, and assistant circuit attorneys to the list of individuals who are exempt from certain concealed carry permit requirements
Title
Adds prosecuting attorneys, assistant prosecuting attorneys, circuit attorneys, and assistant circuit attorneys to the list of individuals who are exempt from certain concealed carry permit requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-02 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1308&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1308I.htm |