MO HB1305 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the regulatory improvement commission to evaluate and provide recommendations for modification, consolidation, or repeal of regulations
Title
Establishes the regulatory improvement commission to evaluate and provide recommendations for modification, consolidation, or repeal of regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - HB 1305 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 135 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 28, 2015, 2:00 p.m., Senate Lounge. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2015-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |