MO HB1305 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-14 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that any member of the crew of a locomotive or train cannot be required to display a driver's license to any law enforcement officer in connection with the operation of a locomotive or train
Title
Specifies that any member of the crew of a locomotive or train cannot be required to display a driver's license to any law enforcement officer in connection with the operation of a locomotive or train
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 1, 2014, 9:45AM, PERSHING GALLERY |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure(S) |
2014-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Objection Filed. Removed from Consent Calendar - Rule 45(b) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2014-01-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |