MO HB1303 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Student Religious Liberties Act
Title
Establishes the Missouri Student Religious Liberties Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 NOES: 1 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, april 30, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2014-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-04-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-02 | House | Perfected (H) - AYES: 128 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 2 |
2014-04-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2014-01-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |