MO HB1299 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections and Elected Officials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates residency requirements for Missouri's members of congress
Title
Creates residency requirements for Missouri's members of congress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |