MO HB1288 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the sunset for the Champion for Children Tax Credit and modifies provisions of a tax credit for donations to maternity homes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the sunset for the Champion for Children Tax Credit and modifies provisions of a tax credit for donations to maternity homes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1288 (2050) HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 103 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1288 (2050) HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 102 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: HB 1288 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 121 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: HB 1288 (HA 4, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 96 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: HB 1288 (*HA 4, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: HB 1288 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-26HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-18HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 102 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-17HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS#2 AYES: 103 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 1
2018-05-17HouseTaken Up
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-15HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-15SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS#2
2018-05-15SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-15SenateTaken Up
2018-05-11SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-08SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-08SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-05-08SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-08SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2018-05-08SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-08SenateTaken Up
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-04-11SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2018-04-11SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 11, 2018, 12:30pm, Bingham Conference Room
2018-04-09SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-04-05SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-03-27SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-03-13SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-09SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 12:00 p.m., Senate Lounge
2018-03-08SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Economic Development(S)
2018-02-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-27HouseThird Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 adopted AYES: 121 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-27HouseTaken Up
2018-02-19HouseReported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
2018-02-19HouseVoted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
2018-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-13HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2018-02-08HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-02-07HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 1 to HA 4, HA 4 as amended AYES: 105 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 1
2018-02-07HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-02-07HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-07HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-01-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-01-29HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-22HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-04HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1288&year=2018&code=R
Texthttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4663H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4663H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4663H.03P.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4663H.03E.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4663S.04C.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4663S.06F.pdf
Texthttps://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/4663S.06T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/020.010.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/020.009.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/020.008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/031.005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/076.072.pdf
Roll Callhttp://house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/076.071.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback