MO HB1283 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding the Division of Tourism Supplemental Revenue Fund.
Title
Changes the law regarding the Division of Tourism Supplemental Revenue Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1283&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3787H.01I.pdf |