MO HB1278 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding certain tax credits and establishes the Developmental Disability Care Provider Tax Credit Program
Title
Changes the laws regarding certain tax credits and establishes the Developmental Disability Care Provider Tax Credit Program
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Long [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-18 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2012-05-18 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-17 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-17 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-17 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-05-17 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-05-15 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY,MAY 17,9:45AM, PERSHING CONFERENCE ROOM | |
2012-05-14 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2012-05-10 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, APRIL 19, 8:30AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 006 | |
2012-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 003 | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-27 | HCS Adopted (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 009 | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |