MO HB1275 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Laid Over (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Laid Over (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the timeframe for the resubmission of a ballot issue in certain instances and the necessary percentage of approval for it to become effective
Title
Specifies the timeframe for the resubmission of a ballot issue in certain instances and the necessary percentage of approval for it to become effective
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |