MO HB1267 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-05 - Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-05 - Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all children over 15 years of age who are in the foster care system or the Division of Youth Services Program to receive a visit to a state university or community or technical college in Missouri
Title
Requires all children over 15 years of age who are in the foster care system or the Division of Youth Services Program to receive a visit to a state university or community or technical college in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Families (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 772 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |