MO HB126 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To establish the "Missouri Stands for the Unborn Act" that places new limits on abortion

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish the "Missouri Stands for the Unborn Act" that places new limits on abortion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 126 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 108 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 126 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 126 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 126 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 110 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 126 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 108 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: HB 126 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: HB 126 (HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 107 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: HB 126 (*HA 1 HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - House - House: HB 126 (HA 5) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 105 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: HB 126 (*HA 5) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: HB 126 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: HB 126 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 106 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-05-24HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2019-05-17HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-17HouseConstitutional Objection Filed (H)
2019-05-17HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-05-17HouseEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 109 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 110 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 1
2019-05-17HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 108 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 1
2019-05-17HouseTaken Up
2019-05-16HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-16HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-16HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-16HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-16SenateReported to the Senate with... (H) - SS
2019-05-15SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S)
2019-05-15SenateThird Read and Passed (S)
2019-05-15SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-15SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-15SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-05-15SenateSS Adopted (S)
2019-05-15SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2019-05-15SenateTaken Up
2019-05-07SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-04-25SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-24SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-04-23SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-04-18SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-10SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-10SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-03SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-01SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 10:30am or upon morning recess, SCR 1
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Health and Pensions (S)
2019-02-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-02-27HouseThird Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 adopted
2019-02-27HouseTaken Up
2019-02-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-26HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-02-26HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 2 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended, HA 2 to HA 2, HA 2 as amended, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5 adopted AYES: 110 NOES: 37 PRESENT: 1
2019-02-26HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-26HouseTaken Up
2019-02-21HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-21HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-21HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-19HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-19HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-30HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB126&year=2019&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0461H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0461H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0461H.01D.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0461S.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0461S.18F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0461S.18T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/027.008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/027.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/027.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/027.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/027.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/027.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/028.002.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6705151250-1469.pdf#1252
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.011.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.013.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.014.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.010.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback