MO HB1253 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Organic-Ready City Designation Program"
Title
Establishes the "Organic-Ready City Designation Program"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1253&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB1253I.PDF |