MO HB1253 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any person who pleads guilty to or is found guilty of certain misdemeanor or felony offenses or who has his or her probation revoked to be liable for specified costs
Title
Requires any person who pleads guilty to or is found guilty of certain misdemeanor or felony offenses or who has his or her probation revoked to be liable for specified costs
Sponsors
Rep. Don Ruzicka [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1253&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1253I.htm |