MO HB1250 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding elections
Title
Changes the laws regarding elections
Sponsors
Rep. Don Ruzicka [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-12 | Vetoed by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-16 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-16 | House Concurs (H) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 149 NOES: 0 | |
2012-05-02 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-04-26 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-10 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-10 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 2, 2:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-02-16 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-02-15 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 001 | |
2012-02-14 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |