MO HB1250 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a motor vehicle driver, when overtaking a bicycle, to pass safely at a distance of not less than three feet
Title
Requires a motor vehicle driver, when overtaking a bicycle, to pass safely at a distance of not less than three feet
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1250&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1250I.htm |