MO HB1249 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Cape Girardeau County to levy, upon voter approval, a sales tax dedicated to 911 services.
Title
Authorizes Cape Girardeau County to levy, upon voter approval, a sales tax dedicated to 911 services.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Hovis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2019-03-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |