MO HB1239 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-02 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-02 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the residential property of individuals 70 years of age or older from increases in assessed valuation that are not from new construction or improvements and from rate increases
Title
Exempts the residential property of individuals 70 years of age or older from increases in assessed valuation that are not from new construction or improvements and from rate increases
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Nance [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2012-01-11 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1239&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1239I.htm |