MO HB1229 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that any fine collected for a red light violation by an entity utilizing an automated photo red light enforcement system must be given to the local school district where the infraction occurred
Title
Specifies that any fine collected for a red light violation by an entity utilizing an automated photo red light enforcement system must be given to the local school district where the infraction occurred
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred: Public Safety (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1229&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1229I.htm |