MO HB1214 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the deadlines for filing a declaration of candidacy
Title
Modifies the deadlines for filing a declaration of candidacy
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinman [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - House - House: BILLS IN CONFERENCE - CCS SCS HCS HB 10 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 155 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: HB 1214 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: HB 1214 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 107 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING - HCS HB 10 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 1, 2023, 2:30 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-04-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2023-04-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. |
2023-04-17 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-04-17 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2023-02-23 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |