MO HB1213 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes “The Fourth Amendment Affirmation Act”.
Title
Establishes “The Fourth Amendment Affirmation Act”.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-05-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |