MO HB1210 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Laid Over (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Laid Over (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a claim clearinghouse to process and verify a request for an offset of an income tax refund and lottery winnings to satisfy an outstanding debt for ambulance services an individual received
Title
Authorizes a claim clearinghouse to process and verify a request for an offset of an income tax refund and lottery winnings to satisfy an outstanding debt for ambulance services an individual received
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-04-24 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-27 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |