MO HB1199 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties of Shelby and Monroe to collect a tax on specified property to pay for road rock on county roads
Title
Authorizes the counties of Shelby and Monroe to collect a tax on specified property to pay for road rock on county roads
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1199&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1199I.htm |