MO HB1199 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-31 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an insurer from requiring any waiting period for health insurance coverage for maternity benefits and requires coverage to begin immediately from the effective date of the policy or plan
Title
Prohibits an insurer from requiring any waiting period for health insurance coverage for maternity benefits and requires coverage to begin immediately from the effective date of the policy or plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Health Insurance (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1199&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1199I.htm |