MO HB1189 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-13 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding local ordinances so that no political subdivision may require interior inspections of private residences
Title
Changes the laws regarding local ordinances so that no political subdivision may require interior inspections of private residences
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Cross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |