MO HB1161 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Joint Committee on the Tenth Amendment
Title
Establishes the Joint Committee on the Tenth Amendment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1161&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1161I.htm |