MO HB1153 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the perfection of security interests
Title
Changes the laws regarding the perfection of security interests
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred: Financial Institutions (H) | |
2012-01-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1153&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1153I.htm |