MO HB1146 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the intrastate manufacturing of certain incandescent lightbulbs is not subject to federal law or regulation
Title
Specifies that the intrastate manufacturing of certain incandescent lightbulbs is not subject to federal law or regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred: Small Business (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1146&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1146I.htm |