MO HB1134 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding insurance coverage for services provided by a licensed occupational, speech, or physical therapist
Title
Changes the laws regarding insurance coverage for services provided by a licensed occupational, speech, or physical therapist
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 2012 12:00 P.M., SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2012-04-19 | Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 026 | |
2012-04-11 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-04-11 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-11 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-04-11 | Laid Over (H) - HCS PENDING | |
2012-04-11 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-29 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-29 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred: Small Business (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |