MO HB1125 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a person with a physical disability or a member of the armed forces on active duty filing a declaration of candidacy by certified mail to designate a representative for the ballot order random drawing
Title
Allows a person with a physical disability or a member of the armed forces on active duty filing a declaration of candidacy by certified mail to designate a representative for the ballot order random drawing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-01-29 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-01-27 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-01-27 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |