MO HB1120 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Earned Income Tax Credit Act authorizing an individual income tax credit equal to 20% of any earned income tax credit claimed on the taxpayer's federal income tax return
Title
Establishes the Missouri Earned Income Tax Credit Act authorizing an individual income tax credit equal to 20% of any earned income tax credit claimed on the taxpayer's federal income tax return
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1120&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1120I.htm |