MO HB1119 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-20 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding background check requirements of in-home service providers and personal care attendants
Title
Changes the laws regarding background check requirements of in-home service providers and personal care attendants
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |