MO HB1111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the release of towed abandoned property and requires the return of nonvehicular personal property within the towed vehicle regardless of payment arrangements
Title
Changes the laws regarding the release of towed abandoned property and requires the return of nonvehicular personal property within the towed vehicle regardless of payment arrangements
Sponsors
Rep. Don Gosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, 8:00AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-12 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 001 | |
2012-04-03 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-04-03 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-21 | Prefiled (H) |