MO HB1110 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Missouri Rx Prescription Drug Program
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Missouri Rx Prescription Drug Program
Sponsors
Rep. David Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-03-15 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1110&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/2150H.03I.pdf |