MO HB1109 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any state or local governmental entity or public building, place, or setting from banning or restricting the practice, mention, celebration, or discussion of any federal holiday
Title
Prohibits any state or local governmental entity or public building, place, or setting from banning or restricting the practice, mention, celebration, or discussion of any federal holiday
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 1:30PM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-12 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 031 | |
2012-04-04 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-21 | Prefiled (H) |