MO HB1107 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of State Highway 5 between the cities of Ava and Mansfield as the "Missouri Fox Trotting Highway"
Title
Designates a portion of State Highway 5 between the cities of Ava and Mansfield as the "Missouri Fox Trotting Highway"
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-18 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-03-28 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MARCH 28, 2012, 8:00AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-02-22 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 012 | |
2012-02-20 | Perfected by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-21 | Prefiled (H) |