MO HB1106 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to wholesalers licensed to sell intoxicating liquor
Title
Modifies provisions relating to wholesalers licensed to sell intoxicating liquor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2023-02-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |