MO HB1106 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding certain public officials
Title
Changes the laws regarding certain public officials
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-10 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-09 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 000 | |
2012-05-09 | House Concurs (H) - SS AS AMENDED AYES: 154 NOES: 000 | |
2012-04-11 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS AS AMENDED | |
2012-04-11 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-11 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2012-04-11 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MARCH 26, 2012, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-03-01 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 003 | |
2012-02-27 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-02-27 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-08 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-31 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-24 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-21 | Prefiled (H) |