MO HB1102 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any person who observes a child being subjected to sexual abuse to immediately report or cause a report to be made to the Children's Division
Title
Requires any person who observes a child being subjected to sexual abuse to immediately report or cause a report to be made to the Children's Division
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-20 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1102&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1102I.htm |