MO HB110 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred: Downsizing State Government(H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred: Downsizing State Government(H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits anyone from using a hand-held electronic wireless communication device while driving a non-commercial motor vehicle unless the device is equipped for hands-free operation and is being used in that manner
Title
Prohibits anyone from using a hand-held electronic wireless communication device while driving a non-commercial motor vehicle unless the device is equipped for hands-free operation and is being used in that manner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |