MO HB110 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires noninvasive vascular laboratories to be accredited by the Intersocietal Commission for the Accreditation of Vascular Laboratories or the American College of Radiology
Title
Requires noninvasive vascular laboratories to be accredited by the Intersocietal Commission for the Accreditation of Vascular Laboratories or the American College of Radiology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2011-01-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB110&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0110I.htm |