MO HB1090 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any Department of Corrections employee who has accrued overtime hours to use those hours as compensatory leave time
Title
Allows any Department of Corrections employee who has accrued overtime hours to use those hours as compensatory leave time
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass Consent |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Senate Committee Room 1, 1:30pm |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 |
2014-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-20 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Corrections(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |