MO HB1084 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds veterans' charitable organizations to the zoning exception regarding the establishment of a retail business selling donated goods in an area where other businesses engage in retail sales
Title
Adds veterans' charitable organizations to the zoning exception regarding the establishment of a retail business selling donated goods in an area where other businesses engage in retail sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-14 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: Veterans (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-19 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1084&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1084I.htm |