MO HB1081 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires reimbursement under the MO HealthNet program for marital and family therapy
Title
Requires reimbursement under the MO HealthNet program for marital and family therapy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred: Health Insurance(H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1081&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB1081I.PDF |