MO HB1081 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Paperless Documents and Forms Act
Title
Establishes the Paperless Documents and Forms Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 28, 2014, 2:30pm, Pershing Conference Room |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass Consent |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 14, 2014, Upon adjournment,. Pershing Gallery |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Senate Committee Room 1, 1:30pm |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 |
2014-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |