MO HB1073 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the City of Springfield to submit to the voters a transient guest tax.
Title
Authorizes the City of Springfield to submit to the voters a transient guest tax.
Sponsors
Rep. John Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-05-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1073&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2277H.01I.pdf |