MO HB1072 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-17 - House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Volunteer Health Services Act to allow certain licensed health professionals to provide services without additional licensure requirements
Title
Establishes the Volunteer Health Services Act to allow certain licensed health professionals to provide services without additional licensure requirements
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference | |
2012-05-14 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS | |
2012-05-14 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 20 NAYS: 4 | |
2012-05-14 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-09 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-03 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-24 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-18 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 24, 1:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-08 | Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment (S) | |
2012-03-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 037 | |
2012-02-29 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-17 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-17 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-13 | Prefiled (H) |