MO HB1070 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Office of Military Advocate to advocate for the military in Missouri
Title
Establishes the Office of Military Advocate to advocate for the military in Missouri
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - HB 1070 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - HB 1070 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 142 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - HB 1070 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - HB 1070 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 142 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - HB 1070 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-25 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-27 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 142 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 30, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 128 NOES: 21 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2015-03-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |