MO HB1065 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a corporation or unincorporated association to be represented in small claims court for certain actions by its president or vice-president for any claim of $500 or less
Title
Authorizes a corporation or unincorporated association to be represented in small claims court for certain actions by its president or vice-president for any claim of $500 or less
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McGhee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Referred: Small Business (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-04 | Read First Time (H) | |
2011-12-13 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1065&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1065I.htm |